THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:48:17 PM
Iracleous, Panayiotis
CPSO#:
82933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 2B9
Phone: (416) 281-7404
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PANAYIOTIS IRACLEOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRACLEOUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 17, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)