THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:50:15 AM
Czikk, Marie Julianna
CPSO#:
82908
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
700 University Ave
Room 3-910
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6499
Fax: (416) 586-8718
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE JULIANNA CZIKK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZIKK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |