THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:37:18 AM
Cescon, David Ward
CPSO#:
82898
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre/UHN
Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2245
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID WARD CESCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CESCON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |