THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:10:32 PM
Channan, Peter Krishan
CPSO#:
82883
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
St. Josephs Healthcare
Emergency Department
ER
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 33997
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER KRISHAN CHANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2010 |