THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:36:17 PM
Doyle, Mary-Anne
CPSO#:
82881
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive, 4th floor
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81946
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY-ANNE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 9 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2011 |