THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:25:29 AM
Petrut, Bianca Simona
CPSO#:
82875
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Victor Babes University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Specialized Geriatric Services
243 Consumers Road, Suite 300
North York, Ontario - M2J4W8
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6871
Fax: 416-756-6438
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BIANCA SIMONA PETRUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRUT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |