THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:29:07 AM
Mrad, Mohamed Amir Ahmad Mazen S
CPSO#:
82872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Plastic Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue M1 525
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4868
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AMIR AHMAD MAZEN S MRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MRAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2005 to 01 Aug 2005
PEAP - R - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2005 to 01 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |