THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:07:05 PM
Myrehaug, Sten Donald
CPSO#:
82867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4834
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEN DONALD MYREHAUG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYREHAUG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |