THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:27:03 PM
Harwood, Robin Peter
CPSO#:
82815
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
09 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-May-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robin Harwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 09 May 2023 |