THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:55:40 AM
Cooper, Michael James
CPSO#:
82797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess St
Kingston ON K7M 3G4
Phone: (613) 531-2667
Fax: (613) 541-0744
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.J. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2010 |