THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:25:43 AM
Stone, Angela Marie
CPSO#:
82788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Critical Care
825 Coxwell Avenut
Toronto, Ontario M4C 3E7
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416)461-8272 Ext. 6563
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELA MARIE STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2010 |