THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:21:22 AM
Sisca, Lyana Isa
CPSO#:
82771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-9900
Fax: (905) 597-8722
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Lyana Sisca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LYANA ISA SISCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |