THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:38:58 AM
Czechowicz, Dominika Magdalena
CPSO#:
82766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
117 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 205
Ottawa ON K2G 5X3
Phone: (613) 421-6111
Fax: (613) 421-9559
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOMINIKA MAGDALENA CZECHOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZECHOWICZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |