THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:58:44 PM
Steeves, Mark Alexander
CPSO#:
82753
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12-585 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
Phone: 613-746-6745
Fax: 613-746-6008
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER STEEVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEVES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |