THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:26:45 AM
Salahudeen, Shafeequr Rahman
CPSO#:
82746
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
1245, Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Fax: (905) 336-4148
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAFEEQUR RAHMAN SALAHUDEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAHUDEEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2012 |