THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:55:02 AM
Heisz, Erin Michelle
CPSO#:
82730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON N5A 5T8
Phone: (519) 508-1212
Fax: (519) 508-1240
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Aug 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIN MICHELLE HEISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEISZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2007 |