THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:38:10 AM
Sambasivan, Aarathi Susheela
CPSO#:
82724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 6233
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARATHI SUSHEELA SAMBASIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMBASIVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 08 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2010 |