THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 15:38:44 PM
Kumar, Ashesh
CPSO#:
82716
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
33 Lombard St
Toronto ON M5C 3H8
Phone: 7054353377 Ext. 2341
Fax: 7054345219
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) |
Hearst |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |