THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:39:53 AM
Rashidi, Farid
CPSO#:
82702
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 May 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 43148
Fax: 905-704-4195
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARID RASHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHIDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2005 |