THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:33:29 PM
Garbedian, Kimberley
CPSO#:
82673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Beardsley, Kimberley (used until: 28 Jul 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2360 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 0E2
Phone: (416) 342-3552
Fax: Fax: (437) 702
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:29 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY GARBEDIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBEDIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2012 |