THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:15:16 PM
Rabinovitch, Deborah Lynn
CPSO#:
82660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Synergy Sports Medicine and
Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON M6H 1V5
Phone: (416) 703-3525
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:22 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 09 Jan 2012
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |