THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:34:39 PM
McPherson, Terrence Patrick
CPSO#:
82632
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
London ON N6G 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3990
Fax: 519-434-3278
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRENCE PATRICK MCPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCPHERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 06 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2016 |