THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:17:52 AM
Fanaras, Effie
CPSO#:
82608
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Queen's University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Snoring and Sleep Clinic
Niagara Falls ON L2E 2G5
Phone: 905-374-6453
Fax: 1-800-905-6992
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:04 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EFFIE FANARAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANARAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |