THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:34:19 PM
Walton, Christine Cynthia
CPSO#:
82600
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C120-11 King St W
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
Phone: 416-368-9990
Fax: 416-479-8688
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CYNTHIA WALTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |