THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:04:48 PM
Green, Ruth-Ann Feliksa
CPSO#:
82581
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Stewart, Ruth-Ann Feliksa (used until: 30 Oct 2005 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUTH-ANN FELIKSA GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 06 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2009 to 17 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2010 |