THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:00:54 AM
Lencses, Kathy Ann
CPSO#:
82557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care
OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Minet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHY ANN LENCSES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENCSES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2012 |