THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:34:36 AM
Greenspoon, Jeffrey Noah
CPSO#:
82546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64706
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY NOAH GREENSPOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPOON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2011 |