THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:23:59 PM
Graver, Alison Marie
CPSO#:
82545
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
308- 770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:05 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISON MARIE GRAVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |