THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:37:40 AM
Armstrong, Kathryn Genevieve Wall
CPSO#:
82527
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN GENEVIEVE WALL ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2010 |