THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:35:20 PM
Amlani, Salima
CPSO#:
82524
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Amlani, Salima Aminmohamed (used until: 07 Jul 2005 )
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:04 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2021 |