THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:22:44 PM
Poynter, Brittany Anne
CPSO#:
82521
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 4165358501 Ext. 30403
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRITTANY ANNE POYNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POYNTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2010 |