THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:34:18 PM
Haddad, Alain
CPSO#:
82508
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Box 928
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-7700 Ext. 25395
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:17 Nov 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAIN HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADDAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2009 to 17 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |