THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:42:36 AM
Kis, Mihaly
CPSO#:
82506
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Queen's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 9052734449
Fax: 9052735503
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIHALY KIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
EL - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
EL - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |