THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:43:48 AM
Peticca, Patricia
CPSO#:
82498
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1309 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7L3
Phone: 613 729-9668
Fax: 613 729-9672
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:23 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICIA PETICCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETICCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 06 Dec 2010 to 06 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2012 |