THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:22:36 PM
Mercado, Ashley John
CPSO#:
82497
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
09 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 1, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 14, 2022, the College was notified, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital had suspended the privileges of Dr. Ashley John Mercado, effective January 1, 2022.
On May 16, 2022, the College was notified by St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital that Dr. Mercado’s privileges were reinstated effective April 1, 2022.
On May 18, 2023, the College was notified, by St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that on April 4, 2023 Dr. Mercado was reappointed to Professional Staff subject to terms and conditions.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2011 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 09 Feb 2024 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 08 Feb 2024
Summary:
On February 8, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Mercado engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately, and without consent or authorization, accessing the health records of approximately 20 individuals who were not under his care, including but not limited to family members, colleagues and others.
The Tribunal ordered that:
- Dr. Mercado attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Mercado’s certificate of registration for four (4) months commencing February 9, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.;
- Dr. Mercado pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 11, 2024.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits; Penalty; Reprimand: February 8, 2024