THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:34:54 PM
Barra, Lillian De Jesus Jeremias
CPSO#:
82437
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Rm D2-160
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-5986
Fax: (519) 646-6072
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:31 Jan 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILLIAN DE JESUS JEREMIAS BARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |