THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:54:51 AM
Bouazza, Djamel
CPSO#:
82430
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: INST NATIONAL D'ENSEIGNEMENT SUPERIEUR, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bouazza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DJAMEL BOUAZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUAZZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2006 |