THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:34:02 AM
Zhang, Irene
CPSO#:
82427
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
515 Dundas Street West, Unit 12
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Phone: 905-901-5558
Fax: 905-901-5588
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:22 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRENE ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2012 |