THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:55:08 PM
Stone, Samuel Bradley
CPSO#:
82423
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1050
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL BRADLEY STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 23 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2011 |