THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:04:35 PM
Kronis, Sarah Ellen
CPSO#:
82413
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5927 Bathurst St
Suite 201
North York ON M2R 3T5
Phone: 4162216522
Fax: 4162219784
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ELLEN KRONIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRONIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2007 |