THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:19:07 AM
Hussain, Yasmine Elizabeth
CPSO#:
82410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Fax: 905 844-5537
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMINE ELIZABETH HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |