THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:10:00 AM
Harlock, John Anthony
CPSO#:
82407
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44575
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British West Indies
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:25 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY HARLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARLOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |