THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:18:57 AM
Francescutti, Valerie Amanda
CPSO#:
82405
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Cent
Division of General Surgery, Depart
B3 Surgical Offices
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 44619
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VALERIE AMANDA FRANCESCUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCESCUTTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2018 |