THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:50:54 AM
Allegro, Sabrina Michelle
CPSO#:
82401
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Cancer Care Clinic
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21500
Fax: (416) 242-1068
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SABRINA MICHELLE ALLEGRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEGRO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2009 |