THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:34:04 PM
Fasih, Najla
CPSO#:
82391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 78212
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:22 Apr 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2015 |
|
Active |