THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:32:42 AM
Khawaja, Noumaan Ahmed
CPSO#:
82380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Heritage Park Medical Centre
200 Lorraine Ave., Unit 8
Kitchener ON N2B 3R3
Phone: 519 7457521
Fax: 5197457524
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NOUMAAN AHMED KHAWAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAWAJA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2020 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2021 |