THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:09:14 PM
Shbash, Iman Ahmed Mohamed
CPSO#:
82345
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1280 Main St W
McMaster Children hospital
Division of General paediatrics
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: 9055214981
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:14 Aug 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IMAN AHMED MOHAMED SHBASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHBASH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 03 May 2005 to 17 Jun 2005
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 09 Aug 2008 to 08 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 09 Aug 2009 to 08 Aug 2010
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |