THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:30:52 PM
Al-Shakman, Khalad M
CPSO#:
82342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Phone: 519-826-0775
Fax: 519-837-2167
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: DR. ALSHAKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 25 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALAD M AL-SHAKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAKMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 08 Jul 2005
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 09 Jul 2005 to 10 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 11 Jul 2006 to 10 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 11 Jul 2007 to 10 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 11 Jul 2008 to 10 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 11 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2011 |