THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:12:36 AM
Marchuk, Graeme George
CPSO#:
82326
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1064 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A4
Phone: (877) 701-5181
Fax: (800) 803-9043
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRAEME GEORGE MARCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
EL - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
EL - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |