THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:51:18 AM
Adler Nevo, Gili Wendy
CPSO#:
82322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Ave.
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 3229
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:22 Aug 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:13 Nov 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2005 to 22 Jun 2005
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 23 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
|
Active |